Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/13/2019 at 15:56:10 (UTC).

ERIC DANIEL SHUGG VS LIZET CASTRO

Case Summary

On 07/26/2016 ERIC DANIEL SHUGG filed an Other lawsuit against LIZET CASTRO. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Encanto Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are McMurry, C. Steven and Cheuvront, Ken. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3565

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Encanto Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

McMurry, C. Steven

Cheuvront, Ken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ERIC DANIEL SHUGG

Defendant

LIZET CASTRO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Martin Bihn

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Continue Trial, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Reconsideration, Result: Moot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Telephone Call, Result: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Pre-Trial Conference Report, Result: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Reply, Sub Type: Counterclaim, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Response, Sub Type: To Motion, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Dismiss, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Answer and Counterclaim, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Complaint, Sub Type: Amended Complaint, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Notice of Appearance, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • Judgment For: ERIC DANIEL SHUGG Judgment Against: LIZET CASTRO, Amount: $11,052.76, Type: Total Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less