This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/29/2019 at 17:09:59 (UTC).

DON W WENTZ Et Al VS TERRACE PROPERTIES Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/13/2017 DON W WENTZ filed an Other lawsuit against TERRACE PROPERTIES. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, East Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Kissell, Tyler and Russell, Keith. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0458

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Kissell, Tyler

Russell, Keith

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DON W WENTZ

ANDREA A WENTZ

Defendants

TERRACE PROPERTIES

JIM LAPOTA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark Tucker

Defendant Attorney

Theodore Horowitz

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Satisfaction Of Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Exhibit, Sub Type: Disposal of Exhibits, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Court, Result: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Application for Attorney Fees, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: For Plaintiff, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: For Defendant, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order of Transfer, Sub Type: JCS for Reassignment, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order of Transfer, Sub Type: Civil Division, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Notice of Appearance, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Transfer From Small Claims to Civil, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Change of Judge for Cause, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Judgment For: DON W WENTZ Judgment For: ANDREA A WENTZ Judgment Against: JIM LAPOTA Judgment Against: TERRACE PROPERTIES, Amount: $915.90, Type: Principal, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Judgment For: DON W WENTZ Judgment For: ANDREA A WENTZ Judgment Against: JIM LAPOTA Judgment Against: TERRACE PROPERTIES, Amount: $172.00, Type: Costs, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Judgment For: DON W WENTZ Judgment For: ANDREA A WENTZ Judgment Against: JIM LAPOTA Judgment Against: TERRACE PROPERTIES, Amount: $3,000.00, Type: Attorney Fee, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.