This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/31/2019 at 09:12:21 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS MARSHALL MORRIS

Case Summary

On 11/17/2017 DISCOVER BANK filed an Other lawsuit against MARSHALL MORRIS. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Agua Fria Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Guzman, Joe. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8944

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Agua Fria Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Guzman, Joe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendants

MARSHALL MORRIS

KALI MORRIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marcus Martinez

Todd Gurstel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Summary, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Summary Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Notice of Substitution, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Pre-Trial Conference Report, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Disclosure Statement, Sub Type: JCRCP Rule 121, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Amended Caption, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • Judgment For: DISCOVER BANK Judgment Against: MARSHALL MORRIS III Judgment Against: KALI MORRIS, Amount: $8,240.99, Type: Total Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less