Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/11/2019 at 08:06:51 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS FRANK T OCHOA

Case Summary

On 05/10/2016 DISCOVER BANK filed an Other lawsuit against FRANK T OCHOA. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Dreamy Draw Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Conti, Frank. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2935

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Dreamy Draw Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Conti, Frank

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendants

FRANK T OCHOA

CARMEN OCHOA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zachary Manty

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Release & Quash Writ, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Judgment For: DISCOVER BANK Judgment Against: FRANK T OCHOA Judgment Against: CARMEN OCHOA, Amount: $1,909.10, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Judgment For: DISCOVER BANK Judgment Against: FRANK T OCHOA Judgment Against: CARMEN OCHOA, Amount: $149.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Judgment For: DISCOVER BANK Judgment Against: FRANK T OCHOA Judgment Against: CARMEN OCHOA, Amount: ($100.00), Type: Offset

    Read MoreRead Less