This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 11/08/2019 at 12:30:37 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS ELIZABETH DAWN GAONA

Case Summary

On 06/21/2018 DISCOVER BANK filed an Other lawsuit against ELIZABETH DAWN GAONA. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Highland Justice Court located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Urie, Steve. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7591

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Urie, Steve

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendants

ELIZABETH DAWN GAONA

FRANK GAONA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Douglas Christensen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed by Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Summary, Result: Judgment Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Pre-Trial Conference Report, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Filed by Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Summary Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Pre-Trial Conference Report, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Pre-Trial Conference Report, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Amend, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Disclosure Statement, Sub Type: JCRCP Rule 121, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed by Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketJudgment For: DISCOVER BANK Judgment Against: ELIZABETH DAWN GAONA Judgment Against: FRANK GAONA, Amount: $9,184.03, Type: Principal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketJudgment For: DISCOVER BANK Judgment Against: ELIZABETH DAWN GAONA Judgment Against: FRANK GAONA, Amount: $161.00, Type: Costs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less