Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/14/2019 at 10:09:43 (UTC).

Discover Bank VS Ardith Mead

Case Summary

On 08/24/2016 Discover Bank filed an Other lawsuit against Ardith Mead. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Encanto Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are McMurry, C. Steven and Cheuvront, Ken. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2295

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Encanto Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

McMurry, C. Steven

Cheuvront, Ken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Ardith Mead

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul Guglielmo

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Release & Quash Writ, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Release & Quash Writ, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Judgment For: Discover Bank Judgment Against: Ardith Mead, Amount: $1,889.30, Type: Total Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less