This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 02/23/2021 at 10:01:25 (UTC).

DIANNE CHAVEZ Et Al VS CAMERON COLVIN

Case Summary

On 12/31/2020 DIANNE CHAVEZ filed an Other lawsuit against CAMERON COLVIN. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Arcadia Biltmore Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Medina, Enrique and Driggs, Leonore. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1741

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arcadia Biltmore Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Medina, Enrique

Driggs, Leonore

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DIANNE CHAVEZ

PHILLIP CHAVEZ

Defendant

CAMERON COLVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew Hull

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • HearingEvent: Eviction Action Hearing; Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • JudgementJudgment For: DIANNE CHAVEZ Judgment For: PHILLIP CHAVEZ Judgment Against: CAMERON COLVIN, Amount: $5,440.00, Type: Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • JudgementJudgment For: DIANNE CHAVEZ Judgment For: PHILLIP CHAVEZ Judgment Against: CAMERON COLVIN, Amount: $300.00, Type: Late Charge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • JudgementJudgment For: DIANNE CHAVEZ Judgment For: PHILLIP CHAVEZ Judgment Against: CAMERON COLVIN, Amount: $103.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • JudgementJudgment For: DIANNE CHAVEZ Judgment For: PHILLIP CHAVEZ Judgment Against: CAMERON COLVIN, Amount: $687.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • JudgementJudgment For: DIANNE CHAVEZ Judgment For: PHILLIP CHAVEZ Judgment Against: CAMERON COLVIN, Amount: $3,049.99, Type: Previous Balance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Summons, Sub Type: Issued, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • HearingEvent: Eviction Action Hearing; Result: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less