This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 11/01/2019 at 06:07:56 (UTC).

DESERT LAKES MANAGEMENT, INC VS ANGELA JUDD NAPOLEON

Case Summary

On 12/22/2017 DESERT LAKES MANAGEMENT, INC filed an Other lawsuit against ANGELA JUDD NAPOLEON. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, South Mountain Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Williams, Cody. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4137

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Mountain Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Williams, Cody

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DESERT LAKES MANAGEMENT, INC

Defendant

ANGELA JUDD NAPOLEON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

J Heldenbrand

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Satisfaction Of Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Petition Discharging Garnishee, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order Discharging Garnishee, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Certificate of Service, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Publication, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Publication, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Judgment For: DESERT LAKES MANAGEMENT, INC Judgment Against: ANGELA JUDD NAPOLEON, Amount: $2,167.72, Type: Principal, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Judgment For: DESERT LAKES MANAGEMENT, INC Judgment Against: ANGELA JUDD NAPOLEON, Amount: $193.02, Type: Interest, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Judgment For: DESERT LAKES MANAGEMENT, INC Judgment Against: ANGELA JUDD NAPOLEON, Amount: $329.33, Type: Costs, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Judgment For: DESERT LAKES MANAGEMENT, INC Judgment Against: ANGELA JUDD NAPOLEON, Amount: $600.00, Type: Attorney Fee, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less