This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/28/2019 at 21:30:47 (UTC).

DEL RIO RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION VS RAFAEL CASTRO

Case Summary

On 08/04/2017 DEL RIO RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against RAFAEL CASTRO. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Agua Fria Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Guzman, Joe. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4296

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Agua Fria Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Guzman, Joe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEL RIO RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendant

RAFAEL CASTRO

Garnishee

BLUE LINE FOODSERVICE DISTRIBUTION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Philip Brown

Defendant Attorney

Bernard Strass

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Corrective Action Notice Sent, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Order Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Reply, Sub Type: To Response, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Disclosure Statement, Sub Type: Supplemental Disclosure Statement, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Summary Judgment, Result: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Response, Sub Type: To Motion, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Dismiss, Result: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Dismiss, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • Judgment For: DEL RIO RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION Judgment Against: RAFAEL CASTRO, Amount: $1,245.50, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • Judgment For: DEL RIO RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION Judgment Against: RAFAEL CASTRO, Amount: $151.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • Judgment For: DEL RIO RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION Judgment Against: RAFAEL CASTRO, Amount: $1,615.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less