This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/30/2019 at 02:35:27 (UTC).

DEL RIO RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION VS CESAR BOJORQUEZ OLIVAS

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 DEL RIO RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against CESAR BOJORQUEZ OLIVAS. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Agua Fria Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Guzman, Joe. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1833

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Agua Fria Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Guzman, Joe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEL RIO RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendant

CESAR BOJORQUEZ OLIVAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Philip Brown

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: e-mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Summons, Sub Type: Issued, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Judgment For: DEL RIO RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION Judgment Against: CESAR BOJORQUEZ OLIVAS, Amount: $1,974.00, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Judgment For: DEL RIO RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION Judgment Against: CESAR BOJORQUEZ OLIVAS, Amount: $101.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Judgment For: DEL RIO RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION Judgment Against: CESAR BOJORQUEZ OLIVAS, Amount: $675.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less