This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 11/05/2019 at 07:01:02 (UTC).

Darrel Jay Anderson VS Partners Animal Institute INC

Case Summary

On 02/12/2018 Darrel Jay Anderson filed an Other lawsuit against Partners Animal Institute INC. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Riggs, Cathy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8962

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Riggs, Cathy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Darrel Jay Anderson

Defendant

Partners Animal Institute INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Timothy Forshey

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Setting Mediation, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Settlement, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Continue Hearing, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Response, Sub Type: To Motion, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Continue Hearing, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Disclosure Statement, Sub Type: JCRCP Rule 121, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Setting Mediation, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Notice of Appearance, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Summons Returned Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order of Transfer, Sub Type: Civil Division, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Transfer From Small Claims to Civil, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.