This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/09/2019 at 17:29:39 (UTC).

CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION VS VANESSA PEREA Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/18/2016 CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION filed an Other lawsuit against VANESSA PEREA. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Encanto Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are McMurry, C. Steven and Cheuvront, Ken. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0479

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Encanto Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

McMurry, C. Steven

Cheuvront, Ken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

Defendants

VANESSA PEREA

ANGEL PEREA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Barry Bursey

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Release & Quash Writ, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Certificate of Service, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Release & Quash Writ, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Corrective Action Notice Sent, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Judgment For: CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION Judgment Against: ANGEL PEREA Judgment Against: VANESSA PEREA, Amount: $4,876.04, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Judgment For: CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION Judgment Against: ANGEL PEREA Judgment Against: VANESSA PEREA, Amount: $196.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Judgment For: CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION Judgment Against: ANGEL PEREA Judgment Against: VANESSA PEREA, Amount: $400.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less