Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/16/2019 at 09:17:18 (UTC).

Credit Acceptance Corporation VS Dustin K Ingram

Case Summary

On 11/01/2016 Credit Acceptance Corporation filed an Other lawsuit against Dustin K Ingram. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Dreamy Draw Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Conti, Frank. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7898

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Dreamy Draw Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Conti, Frank

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Credit Acceptance Corporation

Defendant

Dustin K Ingram

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Barry Bursey

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Stipulated, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Stipulation and Order of Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Mediation, Sub Type: Agreement, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Returned Mail, Sub Type: For Defendant, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Setting Mediation, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Corrective Action Notice Sent, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Extend Time for Service, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Extend Time for Service, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Judgment For: Credit Acceptance Corporation Judgment Against: Dustin K Ingram, Amount: $7,491.45, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Judgment For: Credit Acceptance Corporation Judgment Against: Dustin K Ingram, Amount: $406.80, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Judgment For: Credit Acceptance Corporation Judgment Against: Dustin K Ingram, Amount: $500.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less