Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/17/2019 at 10:43:36 (UTC).

COURTYARD AT ENCANTO VS Trudy Ann Small

Case Summary

On 12/13/2016 COURTYARD AT ENCANTO filed an Other lawsuit against Trudy Ann Small. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Encanto Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are McMurry, C. Steven and Cheuvront, Ken. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4841

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Encanto Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

McMurry, C. Steven

Cheuvront, Ken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COURTYARD AT ENCANTO

Defendant

Trudy Ann Small

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thayne Cullimore

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order Discharging Garnishee, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order Discharging Garnishee, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Stipulated, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Telephone Call, Result: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Judgment For: COURTYARD AT ENCANTO Judgment Against: Trudy Ann Small, Amount: $1,829.17, Type: Total Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less