This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/31/2019 at 02:32:24 (UTC).

CJA AUTO SALES INC. VS RYAN GARY HARVEY

Case Summary

On 11/08/2017 CJA AUTO SALES INC filed an Other lawsuit against RYAN GARY HARVEY. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, North Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Ash, Cecil. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1267

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Ash, Cecil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CJA AUTO SALES INC.

Defendants

RYAN GARY HARVEY

AMANDA HARVEY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order Discharging Garnishee, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Judgment For: CJA AUTO SALES INC. Judgment Against: RYAN GARY HARVEY, Amount: $4,154.33, Type: Total Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.