This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 03/05/2022 at 12:42:48 (UTC).

CJA AUTO SALES, INC. VS OLIVA F. JOSHUA

Case Summary

On 11/02/2020 CJA AUTO SALES, INC filed an Other lawsuit against OLIVA F JOSHUA. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Desert Ridge Justice Court located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Riggs, Cathy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7018

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Riggs, Cathy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CJA AUTO SALES, INC.

Defendant

OLIVA F. JOSHUA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • JudgementJudgment For: CJA AUTO SALES, INC. Judgment Against: OLIVA F. JOSHUA, Amount: $6,077.18, Type: Total Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • HearingEvent: Mediation; Result: Full Settlement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Mediation, Sub Type: Outcome Notice, Result: Full Settlement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • HearingEvent: Mediation; Result: Continued - Plaintiff's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Continue Hearing, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Continue Hearing, Result: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Mediation, Sub Type: Outcome Notice, Result: Plaintiff Failed to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Setting Mediation, Result: Mailed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Setting Mediation, Result: Mailed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Waiver/Deferral, Sub Type: Waiving Court Costs, Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed by Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Complaint, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less