This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 11/10/2019 at 12:24:17 (UTC).

CJ AUTO INC VS DAVID AARON QUINTANA

Case Summary

On 09/21/2018 CJ AUTO INC filed an Other lawsuit against DAVID AARON QUINTANA. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, North Mesa Justice Court located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Ash, Cecil. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6366

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Ash, Cecil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CJ AUTO INC

Defendant

DAVID AARON QUINTANA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order Discharging Garnishee, Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Petition Discharging Garnishee, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order Discharging Garnishee, Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Petition Discharging Garnishee, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Returned Mail, Sub Type: For Defendant, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Returned Mail, Sub Type: For Defendant, Result: Received

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2018
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketJudgment For: CJ AUTO INC Judgment Against: DAVID AARON QUINTANA Jr., Amount: $9,463.85, Type: Total Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less