This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 01/15/2020 at 09:51:08 (UTC).

Citibank N.A VS Clelia L Elias

Case Summary

On 04/24/2019 Citibank N A filed an Other lawsuit against Clelia L Elias. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, White Tank Justice Court located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Osterfeld, David. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3093

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Osterfeld, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Citibank N.A

Defendant

Clelia L Elias

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicolena Milicevic

Defendant Attorney

J Zeigler

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Accounting, Sub Type: Adjustment, Result: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Stipulated, Result: Signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Stipulation and Order of Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Pre-Trial Conference Report, Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Filed by Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Pre-Trial Conference Report, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Filed by Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed by Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • JudgementJudgment For: Citibank N.A Judgment Against: Clelia L Elias, Amount: $5,890.72, Type: Principal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • JudgementJudgment For: Citibank N.A Judgment Against: Clelia L Elias, Amount: $143.50, Type: Costs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less