This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/29/2019 at 07:49:35 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER CHIN VS JAMES LANHAM Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2017 CHRISTOPHER CHIN filed an Other lawsuit against JAMES LANHAM. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, San Tan Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Goodman, Sam. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7587

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Tan Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Goodman, Sam

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHRISTOPHER CHIN

Defendants

JAMES LANHAM

LAYANIE AHLERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew Hull

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Returned Mail, Sub Type: For Defendant, Result: Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Vacate, Result: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Post/Mail, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Complaint, Sub Type: Eviction Action Complaint, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • , Status: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • , Status: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • , Status: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • , Status: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • , Status: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • , Status: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less