Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/14/2019 at 17:42:53 (UTC).

Challenge Financial Services VS Yolanda Rodriguez Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/08/2016 Challenge Financial Services filed an Other lawsuit against Yolanda Rodriguez. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Encanto Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are McMurry, C. Steven and Cheuvront, Ken. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0385

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Encanto Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

McMurry, C. Steven

Cheuvront, Ken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Challenge Financial Services

Defendants

Yolanda Rodriguez

Camille C Galindo

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Vacate, Result: Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Document Received, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Returned Mail, Sub Type: For Defendant, Result: Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Small Claims Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Small Claims, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Judgment For: CHALLENGE FINANCIAL SERVICES Judgment Against: Camille C Galindo Judgment Against: Yolanda Rodriguez, Amount: $3,500.00, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Judgment For: CHALLENGE FINANCIAL SERVICES Judgment Against: Camille C Galindo Judgment Against: Yolanda Rodriguez, Amount: $132.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less