Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/09/2019 at 18:15:57 (UTC).

CHALLENGE FINANCIAL SERVICES VS Demarian Leflore Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/21/2016 CHALLENGE FINANCIAL SERVICES filed an Other lawsuit against Demarian Leflore. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Encanto Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are McMurry, C. Steven and Cheuvront, Ken. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1130

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Encanto Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

McMurry, C. Steven

Cheuvront, Ken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHALLENGE FINANCIAL SERVICES

Defendants

Demarian Leflore

Danelle Davis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Satisfaction Of Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Telephone Call, Result: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • Judgment For: CHALLENGE FINANCIAL SERVICES Judgment Against: Demarian Leflore Judgment Against: Danelle Davis, Amount: $3,500.00, Type: Principal, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • Judgment For: CHALLENGE FINANCIAL SERVICES Judgment Against: Demarian Leflore Judgment Against: Danelle Davis, Amount: $359.00, Type: Costs, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less