This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/30/2019 at 09:05:56 (UTC).

CC GREENS PARTNERS LP VS EMERALD J KITTRELL

Case Summary

On 10/11/2017 CC GREENS PARTNERS LP filed an Other lawsuit against EMERALD J KITTRELL. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, North Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Ash, Cecil. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0415

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Ash, Cecil

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CC GREENS PARTNERS LP

U.S. Collections West, Inc.

Defendant

EMERALD J KITTRELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott Clark

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Returned Mail, Sub Type: For Defendant, Result: No Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Accounting, Sub Type: Adjustment, Result: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Assignment of Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Imaged Case File, Result: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Judgment For: CC GREENS PARTNERS LP Judgment Against: EMERALD J KITTRELL, Amount: $1,506.22, Type: Total Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.