Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/28/2019 at 03:39:38 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC VS WILFREDO AVILESWEST

Case Summary

On 07/03/2017 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed an Other lawsuit against WILFREDO AVILESWEST. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, East Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Russell, Keith. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1549

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Russell, Keith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

WILFREDO AVILESWEST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nelson Ewing

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Release Of Garnishee, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Certificate of Service, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Judgment For: CAVALRY SPV I LLC Judgment Against: WILFREDO AVILESWEST, Amount: $1,469.19, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Judgment For: CAVALRY SPV I LLC Judgment Against: WILFREDO AVILESWEST, Amount: $148.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less