This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 12/19/2017 at 09:25:40 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC VS VIRGIL L. ERWIN

Case Summary

On 08/23/2017 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed an Other lawsuit against VIRGIL L ERWIN. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, White Tank Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Osterfeld, David. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8020

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    White Tank Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Osterfeld, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendants

VIRGIL L. ERWIN

DEBRA ERWIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wendy Gillott

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Stipulated, Judge: Osterfeld, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Stipulation and Order of Judgment, Judge: Osterfeld, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Pre-Trial Conference Report, Judge: Osterfeld, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Judge: Osterfeld, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Pre-Trial Conference Report, Judge: Osterfeld, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Judge: Osterfeld, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Amended Caption, Judge: Osterfeld, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Disclosure Statement, Sub Type: JCRCP Rule 121, Judge: Osterfeld, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Judge: Osterfeld, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Judge: Osterfeld, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Judge: Osterfeld, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Waiver/Deferral, Sub Type: Waiving Court Costs, Judge: Osterfeld, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Waiver/Deferral, Sub Type: Application for Waiver/Deferral, Judge: Osterfeld, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • Judgment For: CAVALRY SPV I LLC Judgment Against: VIRGIL L. ERWIN Judgment Against: DEBRA ERWIN, Amount: $946.81, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • Judgment For: CAVALRY SPV I LLC Judgment Against: VIRGIL L. ERWIN Judgment Against: DEBRA ERWIN, Amount: $150.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • Judgment For: CAVALRY SPV I LLC Judgment Against: VIRGIL L. ERWIN Judgment Against: DEBRA ERWIN, Amount: ($182.00), Type: Offset

    Read MoreRead Less