This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 11/01/2019 at 06:06:57 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC VS SYLVIA VARGAS

Case Summary

On 12/22/2017 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against SYLVIA VARGAS. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Manistee Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Watts, Donald. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4110

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manistee Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Watts, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

Defendant

SYLVIA VARGAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nelson Ewing

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Release & Quash Writ, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • Judgment For: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC Judgment Against: SYLVIA VARGAS, Amount: $1,151.03, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • Judgment For: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC Judgment Against: SYLVIA VARGAS, Amount: $300.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • Judgment For: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC Judgment Against: SYLVIA VARGAS, Amount: $149.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less