This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/12/2019 at 11:14:03 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC VS Michelle C Contreras

Case Summary

On 06/15/2016 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Michelle C Contreras. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Encanto Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are McMurry, C. Steven and Cheuvront, Ken. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6467

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Encanto Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

McMurry, C. Steven

Cheuvront, Ken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

Defendant

Michelle C Contreras

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Whitney Jacobson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Stipulated, Result: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Stipulation and Order of Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Alternative Method of Service, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Extend Time for Service, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • Judgment For: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC Judgment Against: Michelle C Contreras, Amount: $2,459.90, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • Judgment For: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC Judgment Against: Michelle C Contreras, Amount: $308.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • Judgment For: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC Judgment Against: Michelle C Contreras, Amount: $50.00, Type: Offset

    Read MoreRead Less