This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 12/23/2019 at 10:34:11 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC VS MELISSA CHAPMAN

Case Summary

On 08/10/2018 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed an Other lawsuit against MELISSA CHAPMAN. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Highland Justice Court located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Urie, Steve. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9696

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Urie, Steve

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendants

MELISSA CHAPMAN

JACK CHAPMAN

Garnishees

GOLDEN RULE CONSOLIDATED ENTERPRISES, LLC

IMEG CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jesse Lopez

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Release & Quash Writ, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2018
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Disclosure Statement, Sub Type: Notice of Service Re 26.1 Disclosure, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Waiver/Deferral, Sub Type: Application for Waiver/Deferral, Result: Filed by Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Waiver/Deferral, Sub Type: Waiving Court Costs, Result: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed by Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • JudgementJudgment For: CAVALRY SPV I LLC Judgment Against: MELISSA CHAPMAN Judgment Against: JACK CHAPMAN, Amount: $2,575.28, Type: Principal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • JudgementJudgment For: CAVALRY SPV I LLC Judgment Against: MELISSA CHAPMAN Judgment Against: JACK CHAPMAN, Amount: $154.00, Type: Costs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less