Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/11/2019 at 09:32:57 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC VS LAURIANE R LITZAU

Case Summary

On 05/12/2016 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed an Other lawsuit against LAURIANE R LITZAU. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Dreamy Draw Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Conti, Frank. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4661

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Dreamy Draw Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Conti, Frank

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

LAURIANE R LITZAU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nelson Ewing

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Release & Quash Writ, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Letter, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • Judgment For: CAVALRY SPV I LLC Judgment Against: LAURIANE R LITZAU, Amount: $3,027.79, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • Judgment For: CAVALRY SPV I LLC Judgment Against: LAURIANE R LITZAU, Amount: $148.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less