This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 06/24/2018 at 10:56:19 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC VS JAMES M WOODWARD

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against JAMES M WOODWARD. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Riggs, Cathy. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6012

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Riggs, Cathy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

Defendant

JAMES M WOODWARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nelson Ewing

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Document Received, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Setting Mediation, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Mediation, Sub Type: Disclosure and Confidentiality Agreement, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Mediation, Sub Type: Agreement, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Mediation, Sub Type: Outcome Notice, Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Waive Appearance of Real Party in Interest, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Setting Mediation, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Disclosure Statement, Sub Type: JCRCP Rule 121, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Waive Appearance of Real Party in Interest, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Disclosure Statement, Sub Type: JCRCP Rule 121, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Setting Mediation, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Continue Hearing, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Setting Mediation, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Complaint, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less