This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/30/2019 at 05:41:46 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC VS DEBRA GEORGE

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed an Other lawsuit against DEBRA GEORGE. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, North Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Ash, Cecil. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6270

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Ash, Cecil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

DEBRA GEORGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Todd Gurstel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Satisfaction Of Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Release & Quash Writ, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Stipulated, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Stipulation and Order of Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Alternative Method of Service, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Extend Time for Service, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Judgment For: CAVALRY SPV I LLC Judgment Against: DEBRA GEORGE, Amount: $1,747.84, Type: Principal, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Judgment For: CAVALRY SPV I LLC Judgment Against: DEBRA GEORGE, Amount: $203.00, Type: Costs, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.