This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/29/2019 at 08:12:43 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC VS COLIN B JOHNSTON

Case Summary

On 08/23/2017 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed an Other lawsuit against COLIN B JOHNSTON. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Dreamy Draw Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Conti, Frank. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7864

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Dreamy Draw Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Conti, Frank

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

COLIN B JOHNSTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Todd Gurstel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Amended Caption, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Judgment For: CAVALRY SPV I LLC Judgment Against: COLIN B JOHNSTON, Amount: $1,231.92, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Judgment For: CAVALRY SPV I LLC Judgment Against: COLIN B JOHNSTON, Amount: $150.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less