This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/28/2019 at 12:08:53 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC VS CLIFFORD CASSIDAY

Case Summary

On 07/18/2017 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against CLIFFORD CASSIDAY. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Agua Fria Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Guzman, Joe. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2104

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Agua Fria Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Guzman, Joe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

Defendant

CLIFFORD CASSIDAY

Garnishees

BANK OF AMERICA

CREDIT UNION WEST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nelson Ewing

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Release Of Garnishee, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Release Of Garnishee, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Release Of Garnishee, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Non-Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Sum certain affidavit, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Judgment For: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC Judgment Against: CLIFFORD CASSIDAY, Amount: $1,188.89, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Judgment For: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC Judgment Against: CLIFFORD CASSIDAY, Amount: $300.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Judgment For: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC Judgment Against: CLIFFORD CASSIDAY, Amount: $148.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less