This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/29/2019 at 08:14:08 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC VS ATTILA KUTI

Case Summary

On 08/23/2017 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against ATTILA KUTI. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Manistee Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Watts, Donald. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7900

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manistee Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Watts, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

Defendant

ATTILA KUTI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nelson Ewing

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Satisfaction Of Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Stipulated, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Stipulation and Order of Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Judgment For: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC Judgment Against: ATTILA KUTI, Amount: $5,060.66, Type: Total Judgment, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less