Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/15/2019 at 21:32:09 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF HSBC BANK NEVADA VS JULIE M REID

Case Summary

On 10/19/2016 CAVALRY SPV I LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF HSBC BANK NEVADA filed an Other lawsuit against JULIE M REID. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Jayne, Clancy and Riggs, Cathy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8909

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Jayne, Clancy

Riggs, Cathy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF HSBC BANK NEVADA

Defendant

JULIE M REID

Garnishee

MED-EX PARAMEDICAL ARIZONA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Whitney Jacobson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order Discharging Garnishee, Result: Order Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Set Aside, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Set Aside, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Corrective Action Notice Sent, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Post/Mail, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Judgment For: CAVALRY SPV I LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF HSBC BANK NEVADA Judgment Against: JULIE M REID, Amount: $806.41, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Judgment For: CAVALRY SPV I LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF HSBC BANK NEVADA Judgment Against: JULIE M REID, Amount: $208.77, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less