This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 05/27/2020 at 23:57:24 (UTC).

CASH TIME TITLE LOANS INC VS VICKIE CALDWELL

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 CASH TIME TITLE LOANS INC filed an Other lawsuit against VICKIE CALDWELL. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, East Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Russell, Keith. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6003

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Russell, Keith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASH TIME TITLE LOANS INC

Defendant

VICKIE CALDWELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sanford Germaine

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order Discharging Garnishee, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Release Of Garnishee, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: CASH TIME TITLE LOANS INC Judgment Against: VICKIE CALDWELL, Amount: $800.00, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: CASH TIME TITLE LOANS INC Judgment Against: VICKIE CALDWELL, Amount: $241.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: CASH TIME TITLE LOANS INC Judgment Against: VICKIE CALDWELL, Amount: $410.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: CASH TIME TITLE LOANS INC Judgment Against: VICKIE CALDWELL, Amount: $830.64, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Application for Attorney Fees, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.