Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/30/2019 at 05:42:04 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE NA VS REDDIN B LEGLER

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 CAPITAL ONE NA filed an Other lawsuit against REDDIN B LEGLER. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, East Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Russell, Keith. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6277

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Russell, Keith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE NA

Defendant

REDDIN B LEGLER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Todd Gurstel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Release Of Garnishee, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Petition Discharging Garnishee, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Judgment For: CAPITAL ONE NA Judgment Against: REDDIN B LEGLER, Amount: $2,954.16, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Judgment For: CAPITAL ONE NA Judgment Against: REDDIN B LEGLER, Amount: $150.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less