Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/18/2019 at 08:56:45 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK VS DONNA M CARPENTER

Case Summary

On 01/04/2017 CAPITAL ONE BANK filed an Other lawsuit against DONNA M CARPENTER. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Dreamy Draw Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Conti, Frank. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1672

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Dreamy Draw Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Conti, Frank

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK

Defendant

DONNA M CARPENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William Kelhoffer

Todd Gurstel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Release & Quash Writ, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Satisfaction Of Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Notice of Appearance, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Notice of Substitution, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Judgment For: CAPITAL ONE BANK Judgment Against: DONNA M CARPENTER, Amount: $6,320.60, Type: Principal, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Judgment For: CAPITAL ONE BANK Judgment Against: DONNA M CARPENTER, Amount: $144.00, Type: Costs, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less