This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 11/01/2019 at 02:41:14 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK VS DIKEI J BELL

Case Summary

On 12/19/2017 CAPITAL ONE BANK filed an Other lawsuit against DIKEI J BELL. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Agua Fria Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Guzman, Joe. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0136

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Agua Fria Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Guzman, Joe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK

Defendant

DIKEI J BELL

Garnishee

CITY OF PHOENIX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lindsey Lamey

Shannon Crane

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Release Of Garnishee, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Notice of Substitution, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • Judgment For: CAPITAL ONE BANK Judgment Against: DIKEI J BELL, Amount: $1,815.49, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • Judgment For: CAPITAL ONE BANK Judgment Against: DIKEI J BELL, Amount: $150.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less