This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/29/2019 at 08:19:21 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK VS CESAR D MONARREZ

Case Summary

On 08/23/2017 CAPITAL ONE BANK filed an Other lawsuit against CESAR D MONARREZ. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, South Mountain Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Williams, Cody. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8031

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Mountain Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Williams, Cody

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK

Defendant

CESAR D MONARREZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Todd Gurstel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Certificate of Service, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • Judgment For: CAPITAL ONE BANK Judgment Against: CESAR D MONARREZ, Amount: $2,529.36, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • Judgment For: CAPITAL ONE BANK Judgment Against: CESAR D MONARREZ, Amount: $150.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less