This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 02/03/2023 at 11:16:24 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA VS SHONDEEN S SWINK

Case Summary

On 06/18/2018 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA filed an Other lawsuit against SHONDEEN S SWINK. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Highland Justice Court located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Ray, Jordan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3826

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Ray, Jordan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

Defendant

SHONDEEN S SWINK

Garnishee

THE CENTERS FOR HABILITATION/TCH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Whitney Jacobson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: Satisfaction Of Judgment; Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: Garnishment Creditor; Sub Type: Release & Quash Writ; Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: Garnishment; Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien; Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: Garnishment Creditor; Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien; Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: Garnishee; Sub Type: Answer (Earnings); Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: Affidavit of Service; Sub Type: Garnishment Return; Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: Writ; Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings; Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: Garnishment Creditor; Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment; Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • HearingEvent Type: Affidavit of Service; Sub Type: Acceptance of Service; Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • HearingEvent Type: Notice; Sub Type: Undesignated; Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2018
  • Judgement(F)or / (A)gainst: Judgement For: CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA; Judgement Against: SHONDEEN S SWINK; Amount: $154.00; Type: Costs; Status: Satisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Judgement(F)or / (A)gainst: Judgement For: CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA; Judgement Against: SHONDEEN S SWINK; Amount: ($100.00); Type: Offset; Status: Satisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • HearingEvent Type: Stipulation and Order of Judgment; Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • HearingEvent Type: Order; Sub Type: Undesignated; Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • HearingEvent Type: Motion; Sub Type: Undesignated; Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • HearingEvent Type: Corrective Action Notice Sent; Result: Mailed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • HearingEvent Type: Judgment; Sub Type: Stipulated; Result: No Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • HearingEvent Type: Stipulation and Order of Judgment; Result: No Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • HearingEvent Type: Order; Sub Type: Dismiss Lack of Service; Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • HearingEvent Type: Notice; Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service; Result: Mailed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less