This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/30/2019 at 17:57:39 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS JUSTIN CHIDESTER

Case Summary

On 10/23/2017 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed an Other lawsuit against JUSTIN CHIDESTER. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Agua Fria Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Guzman, Joe. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0330

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Agua Fria Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Guzman, Joe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

JUSTIN CHIDESTER

Garnishees

GODADDY.COM, LLC

AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lindsey Lamey

Todd Gurstel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Release Of Garnishee, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Release Of Garnishee, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Notice of Substitution, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Judgment For: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. Judgment Against: JUSTIN CHIDESTER, Amount: $2,657.77, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Judgment For: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. Judgment Against: JUSTIN CHIDESTER, Amount: $150.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less