Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/07/2019 at 07:36:10 (UTC).

Capital One Bank (USA) NA VS Jacob R Russell

Case Summary

On 01/08/2016 Capital One Bank USA NA filed an Other lawsuit against Jacob R Russell. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Dreamy Draw Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Conti, Frank. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3360

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Dreamy Draw Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Conti, Frank

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank (USA) NA

Defendant

Jacob R Russell

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Zachary Manty

Todd Gurstel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Notice of Appearance, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Extend Time for Service, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • Judgment For: Capital One Bank (USA) NA Judgment Against: Jacob R Russell, Amount: $1,469.38, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • Judgment For: Capital One Bank (USA) NA Judgment Against: Jacob R Russell, Amount: $208.67, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less