This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 12/05/2017 at 10:16:23 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS ELIZABETH S EVERETT

Case Summary

On 08/23/2017 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed an Other lawsuit against ELIZABETH S EVERETT. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Highland Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Urie, Steve. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7794

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highland Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Urie, Steve

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendants

ELIZABETH S EVERETT

ROY EVERETT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Corrinne Viola

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Judge: Urie, Result: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Judge: Urie, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Amended Caption, Judge: Urie, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Amended Caption, Judge: Urie, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Judge: Urie, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Judge: Urie, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Judgment For: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. Judgment Against: ELIZABETH S EVERETT Judgment Against: ROY EVERETT, Amount: $1,887.96, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Judgment For: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. Judgment Against: ELIZABETH S EVERETT Judgment Against: ROY EVERETT, Amount: $150.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less