Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/19/2019 at 18:51:43 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NA VS Danielle C Davis

Case Summary

On 02/23/2017 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , NA filed an Other lawsuit against Danielle C Davis. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Encanto Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are McMurry, C. Steven and Cheuvront, Ken. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7281

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Encanto Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

McMurry, C. Steven

Cheuvront, Ken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NA

Defendant

Danielle C Davis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Whitney Jacobson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Satisfaction Of Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Petition Discharging Garnishee, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Certificate of Service, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Release & Quash Writ, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Judgment For: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NA Judgment Against: Danielle C Davis, Amount: $2,869.16, Type: Principal, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Judgment For: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NA Judgment Against: Danielle C Davis, Amount: $149.00, Type: Costs, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less