Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/28/2019 at 08:57:02 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA VS BABETTE E ELSBURY

Case Summary

On 07/13/2017 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA filed an Other lawsuit against BABETTE E ELSBURY. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, East Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Russell, Keith. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8063

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Russell, Keith

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

Defendant

BABETTE E ELSBURY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jacqueline Ligas

Todd Gurstel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Release & Quash Writ, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Notice of Appearance, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Judgment For: CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA Judgment Against: BABETTE E ELSBURY, Amount: $2,713.63, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Judgment For: CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA Judgment Against: BABETTE E ELSBURY, Amount: $144.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less