This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/29/2019 at 08:20:37 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA VS ABDULLAH SHAMSIDDEEN

Case Summary

On 08/23/2017 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA filed an Other lawsuit against ABDULLAH SHAMSIDDEEN. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, South Mountain Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Williams, Cody. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8064

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Mountain Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Williams, Cody

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

Defendant

ABDULLAH SHAMSIDDEEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Todd Gurstel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Judgment For: CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA Judgment Against: ABDULLAH SHAMSIDDEEN, Amount: $2,080.54, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Judgment For: CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA Judgment Against: ABDULLAH SHAMSIDDEEN, Amount: $150.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less