Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/09/2019 at 03:22:53 (UTC).

Capital One Bank (USA), N. A. VS Anthony J Ricci

Case Summary

On 03/14/2016 Capital One Bank USA , N A filed an Other lawsuit against Anthony J Ricci. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Jayne, Clancy and Riggs, Cathy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5475

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Jayne, Clancy

Riggs, Cathy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank (USA), N. A.

Defendant

Anthony J Ricci

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Greenberg

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Mediation, Sub Type: Outcome Notice, Result: Defendant Failed to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: For Plaintiff, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Mediation, Sub Type: Outcome Notice, Result: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Setting Mediation, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Post/Mail, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Judgment For: Capital One Bank (USA), N. A. Judgment Against: Anthony J Ricci, Amount: $2,261.49, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Judgment For: Capital One Bank (USA), N. A. Judgment Against: Anthony J Ricci, Amount: $208.67, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less