This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/31/2019 at 11:22:19 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK, NA VS STEVEN V DAY

Case Summary

On 11/21/2017 CAPITAL ONE BANK, NA filed an Other lawsuit against STEVEN. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Highland Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Urie, Steve. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1511

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highland Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Urie, Steve

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK, NA

Defendant

STEVEN V DAY

Garnishees

JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

HOME POINT FINANCIAL CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Whitney Jacobson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Satisfaction against Garnishee, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Judgment Against Garnishee, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application Judgment Against Garnishee, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Non-Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Non-Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Release & Quash Writ, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • Judgment For: CAPITAL ONE BANK, NA Judgment Against: STEVEN V DAY, Amount: $1,255.84, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • Judgment For: CAPITAL ONE BANK, NA Judgment Against: STEVEN V DAY, Amount: $150.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • Judgment For: CAPITAL ONE BANK, NA Judgment Against: STEVEN V DAY, Amount: ($80.00), Type: Offset

    Read MoreRead Less