This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/07/2019 at 20:16:40 (UTC).

CAPITAL MEWS APARTMENTS LP VS SOL JAFFE

Case Summary

On 01/25/2016 CAPITAL MEWS APARTMENTS LP filed an Other lawsuit against SOL JAFFE. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Encanto Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are McMurry, C. Steven and Cheuvront, Ken. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4824

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Encanto Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

McMurry, C. Steven

Cheuvront, Ken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL MEWS APARTMENTS LP

Defendant

SOL JAFFE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew Hull

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Reconsideration, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Reconsideration, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Undesignated, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Undesignated, Result: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Appeal Record, Sub Type: Ready for Pick-up, Result: Accepted/Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Reconsideration, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Returned Mail, Sub Type: For Defendant, Result: Received

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Telephone Call, Result: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Reconsideration, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Reply, Sub Type: To Response, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Response, Sub Type: To Motion, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Response, Sub Type: To Motion, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Reconsideration, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • Judgment For: CAPITAL MEWS APARTMENTS LP Judgment Against: SOL JAFFE, Amount: $1,259.21, Type: Total Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less