This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 11/04/2019 at 08:25:35 (UTC).

CALVARY SPV I, LLC VS ANTHONY LOPEZ

Case Summary

On 01/04/2018 CALVARY SPV I, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against ANTHONY LOPEZ. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Downtown Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Medina, Enrique. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2988

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Medina, Enrique

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALVARY SPV I, LLC

Defendant

ANTHONY LOPEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nelson Ewing

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Default Judgment And Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Sum certain affidavit, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Extend Time for Service, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • Judgment For: CALVARY SPV I, LLC Judgment Against: ANTHONY LOPEZ, Amount: $7,160.76, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • Judgment For: CALVARY SPV I, LLC Judgment Against: ANTHONY LOPEZ, Amount: $300.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • Judgment For: CALVARY SPV I, LLC Judgment Against: ANTHONY LOPEZ, Amount: $149.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less